Kvh board of directors
WebMay 3, 2024 · Two of KVH’s current directors, Mark S. Ain and Stanley K. Honey, are expected to conclude their service on the Board at the Annual Meeting. “Mr. Ain and Mr. … WebJan 18, 2024 · All board meetings are open to the public. Meet The Board of Commissioners. Mark Sigfrinius; Ron Ihrig; Crystal Scott, Board President; Connie Pond; Larry Hoctor; …
Kvh board of directors
Did you know?
WebJul 9, 2024 · Danelle M. Barrett Elected to Board of Directors for KVH Industries Stockholders voted during annual meeting July 09, 2024 08:00 ET Source: KVH … WebJun 22, 2024 · The Board also appointed two seasoned industry executives, David Kagan and David Tolley, as directors of KVH. Mr. Bruun has served as KVH’s Interim President and Chief Executive Officer...
WebMay 17, 2024 · KVH has nominated two new highly qualified independent director candidates – Cielo Hernandez and Cathy-Ann Martine-Dolecki – both of whom have valuable experience as leaders in industries... WebMar 1, 2012 · EX-10.1 2 d312056dex101.htm SIXTH AMENDMENT, DATED MARCH 1, 2012 Sixth Amendment, dated March 1, 2012 . Exhibit 10.1 . SIXTH AMENDMENT . THIS SIXTH AMENDMENT (this “Amendment”) is made as of the 1st day of March, 2012 by and between KVH Industries, Inc., a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business located at …
WebMay 3, 2024 · Nominates Two New Independent Director Candidates Files Preliminary Proxy Statement Urges Stockholders to Vote for KVH’s Slate of Director Nominees at 2024 Annual Meeting ... February 11, 2024 WebOther. $16,563. Total Compensation. $689,771. Board of Directors in KVH INDUSTRIES INC. For its 2024 fiscal year, KVH INDUSTRIES INC, listed the following board members on its annual proxy statement to the SEC. Name. Total COMPENSATION. Cathy-Ann …
WebEffective June 21, 2024, Brent C. Bruun was appointed to the KVH Board of Directors in addition to assuming the positions of President and Chief Executive Officer after …
http://www.kvhealth.net/index.php/kvh/pages/board-of-Commissioners earthamoonWebJun 22, 2024 · The Board also appointed two seasoned industry executives, David Kagan and David Tolley, as directors of KVH. Mr. Bruun has served as KVH’s Interim President … earth amphibiaWebFeb 3, 2024 · The Company will accept the resignation of one of its incumbent directors, which resignation will become effective at the 2024 Annual Meeting. Following the election of Mr. Deckoff at the 2024 Annual Meeting, the KVH Board will continue to … earth amp petWebBoard of Directors Bill Boyum, President Penny Hein, Vice President Jerry Grebb, Treasurer Cindy Smith, Secretary Connie Anderson Livier Baldovinos Brian Cullinane Jim Daly … ctcp feconWebJun 7, 2024 · On behalf of the Board, Martin Kits van Heyningen, KVH’s chairman and chief executive officer, commented, “ ISS’s recommendation further supports what we have been saying for some time: our ... ctcp frtWebJun 22, 2024 · The Board also appointed two seasoned industry executives, David Kagan and David Tolley, as directors of KVH. Mr. Bruun has served as KVH’s Interim President and Chief Executive Officer since ... ctc peterborough ontWebKVH Industries Reports Fourth Quarter and Full Year 2024 Results: 3/14/2024: KVH Industries to Host Fourth Quarter/Year-end Conference Call on March 16, 2024: 3/8/2024: … earth a million years ago